Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
4855 Lane Associates, Lp, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Hrdlicka, Steven R., against Vue, Ka, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGuire, Rosemary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
Category32 Limited - Residential Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
11/18/2021 Proof of Service Proof of Service By Mail on 11/17/21 of Application and Notice of Renewal of Judgment |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
11/16/2021 Notice Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
11/16/2021 Memorandum of Costs Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed Costs: $117.50 Credit: $381.32 Interest: $1,126.96 |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
11/16/2021 Declaration Declaration Filed RE:Interest |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
11/16/2021 Application for Renewal of Judgment Application for and Renewal of Judgment Filed Application for and Notice of Renewal of Judgment issued for Judgment of case originally entered on 03/19/2012 . Judgment entered in the total amount of $2,391.11 as to the following defendant(s): Ka Vue |
|
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Return filed Return of Writ of Execution issued on 4/11/12 filed partially satisified in the amount of $459.22 cc |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE272768. |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $1621.22 km | |
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Unlawful Detainer Dismissal
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
March 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Memo of costs after judgment Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $0.00 Interest: $3.25 Costs: $110.00 km |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.