Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Phillips, Vickie, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Gamoian, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2011 |
Category09 Limited - Other Collections Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Not Entered Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: dismissal entered previously |
|
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Requested by Plaintiff with estimated time of 2 hrs. Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
|
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Trial |
|
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment Court Trial Requested by Plaintiff with estimated time of 2 hrs. |
|
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Case Management Conference CMC set for May 9, 2016 at 9:00 AM in Rm. 104 |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing In order to process this request you will need to submit PCV-10 collection case status Declaration request for case management conference. You will receive a hearing date for a Case Management Conference at which time trial dates will be set if the case is at issue. Please find enclosed form PCV-10. |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request filed Request for Trial Date filed. No action taken. Collection Case Status Declaration/Request for Case Management Conference to be filed, attorneys office notified. cc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.