Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Medina, Yvonne, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Save Mart Supermarkets, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Snauffer, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSnauffer, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management136 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time151 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Entire action dismissed with prejudice. dhouston Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
May 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
CRC 225 Dismissal Order No parties having appeared at the CRC 225 Dismissal hearing, this case is ordered dismissed without prejudice by Judge Simpson. db |
|
May 29, 2012 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 After Settlement | |
May 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 25-MAY-2012 by DBRENGELMAN. |
|
May 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 25-MAY-2012 by DBRENGELMAN. |
|
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of CRC 225 Hrng Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 10-FEB-2012 by DBRENGELMAN. |
|
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for CMC scheduled for 5/14/12. 225 Dismissal Hearing set for 5/29/12 at 1:00 in Dept. 404. db | |
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
POS of summons & comp - subst. Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Jennifer Stonier - legal secretary, mailed on 01/17/12. cs |
|
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of settlement filed Notice of settlement of entire action filed pursuant to CRC 3.1385. Dismissal to be filed by: 3/26/12 db |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.