Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Schultheiss, Charles Christopher, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGuire, Rosemary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1085 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Return filed Final Return to Court Writ of Execution Issue Date 08/16/2011 Writ Expired, Partially Satisfied Money Paid to Creditor/Attorney $321.51 csp |
|
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 24-FEB-2012 by KROSPIGLIOSI. |
|
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge McGuire Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: K Rospigliosi Reporter: 9/30/31 AM Nature of Hearing: Order Show Cause Name Change Proof of Publication filed in court. Motion is granted. Order signed. lp |
|
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of publication filed Proof of publication of name change filed. First date of publication 1-12-12 . (gac) |
|
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Name change judgment filed Judgment change of name signed by Judge Rosemary T. McGuire filed. New name C Christopher Schultheiss. (gac) |
|
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Name Change
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$395.00 was made on receipt CVCE160157. |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: New Civil Case Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.