Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fronk'S Mountain Drilling Co., Inc., Fronk, Richard, filed a(n) 42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) case against Meadowbrook Insurance, Star Insurance, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Snauffer, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSnauffer, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management129 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
Category42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions293 days |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time293 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 24-OCT-2012 by KROSPIGLIOSI. |
|
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 24-OCT-2012 by KROSPIGLIOSI. |
|
October 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Ikeda Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: M.Mendoza (kr) Reporter: Not Recorded Nature of Hearing: Order to Show Cause Dismissal -- Plaintiff failed to appear at Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal. Case is Dismissed without prejudice in court. No sanctions issued. mgs |
|
October 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissed by court Court orders action dismissed without prejudice. mgs |
|
October 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Dismissal
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
August 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 23-AUG-2012 by KMLATT. |
|
August 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 17-AUG-2012 by JVERBERA. |
|
August 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
August 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Ikeda Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: K. Rospigliosi (jv) Reporter: Tape : 10:17:38 Nature of Hearing: Order to Show Cause continued to 10/18/12 at 10am in Dept 401 for same Continue in order to show proof of service. Possible $150.00 Sanction to be imposed for failure to appear. Court orderes plaintiff to appear at next hearing of 10/18/12. if no appearances,then case will be dismissed kl |
|
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 19-JUL-2012 by KMLATT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.