Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Correia, Kathleen, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case against Torosian, David, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGuire, Rosemary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1125 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Renewal TRO Renewal of restraining order to stop harassment signed by Judge Gamoian and filed. Restraining order expiration date: 1/26/2018 lp |
|
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request filed Request to Renew Restraining Order filed. gs |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Nunez Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: J Yang Reporter: 10/23/43 Nature of Hearing: Show Cause Regard Harassment The Court grants permanent injuncitive relief. The conditions of the restraining order are adopted as the order of the court with the modification on yardage to 100 yards. The Permanent injunction is to remain in full force and effect for a period of three years from today's date until January 26, 2015. Parties Kathleen Correia; Susan Phillips; David Torosian sworn and testified. lp |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Regard Harassment
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Harassment Order after Hearing Restraining order after hearing to stop harassment signed by Judge Nunez and filed. Restraining order expiration date: 1/26/2015 lp |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 26-JAN-2012 by ZEYANG. |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of temporary restraining order filed. Served on Dave Torosian by personal service on 1/11/2012 . le |
|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing and TRO Notice of hearing and temporary restraining order (CLETS) re: harassment signed by Judge Rosemary T. McGuire filed. Temporary restraining order granted. Date: 1-26-12 Time: 9:30am Dept.: 401 mmm |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: New Civil Case Filed |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona csp Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.