Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ainsworth, Cynthia, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case against Ritchie, Jason, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGuire, Rosemary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions27 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time571 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order filed Stipulation and Order having been so stipulated by the parties, it is Hereby Ordered: The Motion for Class Certification currently set for 10-1-13, id hereby vacated, and reset for 12-17-13 at 3:30 p.m. in Dept. #402, etc., signed by Judge Jeff Hamilton and filed. gs |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 26-JAN-2012 by ZEYANG. |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Nunez Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: J Yang Reporter: 10/21/17 Nature of Hearing: Show Cause Regard Harassment Matter is taken off calendar and dismissed without prejudice due to non-appearance by parties. No temporary restraining order previously issued. lp |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Regard Harassment
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
TRO petition Denied Temporary Restraining Order filed and Denied by Judge Rosemary T. McGuire. An Order to Show Cause hearing is set for 1-26-12 at 9:30am in Dept. 401. mmm |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: New Civil Case Filed |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Order: TRO Forwarded to: Dept #401 lmi |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Orders to Stop Harassment filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.