Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fresno County Jury Commissioner, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case against Frankenberger, Colleen Rebecca Lynn, Foster, Tyler Daniel, Flores, Alhondra E. Mosqueda, Ferrol, Ashley Ann, Falls, Connie Shontae, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Gary D. Hoff presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2011 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time44 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Attempted service of juror OSC Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed. csp |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Contempt
Judge: Hoff, Gary |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Attempted service of juror OSC Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed. csp |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Juror unserved - excused/disq Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed - juror had moved. Hearing off calendar |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Juror unserved - excused/disq Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed - juror had moved. Hearing off calendar |
|
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Attempted service of juror OSC Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed. csp |
|
January 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Attempted service of juror OSC Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed. nm |
|
January 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Juror unserved - excused/disq Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed - juror had moved. Hearing off calendar |
|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Attempted service of juror OSC Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed. nm |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of service of juror OSC Proof of service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt served on 12/27/11 by personal delivery. lmi |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.