Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Central Valley Concrete, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Phoenix Underground Construction, Inc, Anda, Joy, Pree, Adrianne, Neal Jr, Chester Lee, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management133 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2011 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial560 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions721 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time876 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment Issued Amount: $479,204.28 |
|
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Off calendar for OSC scheduled for 6-13-14, Judgment entered mmm | |
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of judgment filed. gar | |
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment by Court Judgment on entire action upon default of defendant(s) Chester Lee Neal, Jr., and Phoenix Underground Construction, Inc. signed by Judge Dale Ikeda and filed. Judgment entered in favor of Central Valley Concrete, Inc. against Chester Lee Neal, Jr., and Phoenix Underground Construction, Inc., Judgment in the amount of: Principal: $ 401,534.28 Interest: $ 65,221.00 Attorney Fees: $ 8,750.00 Costs: $ 3,699.00 Total: $ 479,204.28 gs |
|
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for continuance granted Cont for OSC from 4-11-14 to 6-13-14, pending entry of judgment mmm |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cal Setting Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 10-APR-2014 by MMENDOZA. |
|
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for continuance granted Cont for OSC from 3-7-14 to 4-11-14, pending request for entry of judgment. mmm |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.