Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Pacheco, Mark A., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Simpson, Alan presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management129 days |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2011 |
Category09 Unlimited - Other Collections |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions97 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time200 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CVCE162083. |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. le | |
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ or Abstract Received Writ or Abstract of Judgment received for issuance. sg |
|
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event | 60-Day Continued CMC | |
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for case management conference scheduled for 2/27/2012 . Judgment entered. le | |
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Clerk's default judgment Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on Jan 3, 2012 for plaintiff(s) Capital One Bank (USA) against defendant(s) Mark A. Pacheco in the sum of: Principal: $ 31,778.83 Interest: $ 3,465.20 Atty Fees: $ 00 Costs: $ 450.00 Total: $ 35,694.03 le |
|
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conf Minutes Case Management Conference continued to 02/27/12 at 1:30 p.m. in Dept 404. Reason: to obtain judgment cs |
|
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | 60-Day Continued CMC | |
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 23-DEC-2011 by DHOUSTON. |
|
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 23-DEC-2011 by DHOUSTON. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.