Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fresno County Jury Commissioner, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case against Dayila, Rick, Combs, Curtis Edward, Jr, Cerpa, Alfred, Carlson, Maxwell Dean, Calvert, Timothy Frank, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hoff, Gary presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2011 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time240 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Juror resolves after hearing Juror OSC resolved after hearing. Fee for service paid. Juror is disqualified/non-resident.slb or is excused/disqualified. |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Juror OSC resolved - new date Juror OSC resolved prior to hearing; Sheriff service recovery fee paid - new date for jury service set |
|
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Juror appear/fee wavd/excused Juror appears at OSC hearing, Sheriff service recovery fee waived, juror disqualified/non-citizen |
|
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Juror OSC resolved - new date Juror OSC resolved prior to hearing; Sheriff service recovery fee paid - new date for jury service set and completed 8/1/11 |
|
July 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Juror OSC resolved - excused Juror OSC resolved prior to hearing; Sheriff service recovery fee paid - juror excused/permanent health |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Juror OSC resolved - excused Juror OSC resolved prior to hearing; Sheriff service recovery fee paid - juror excused/medical.slbd. |
|
July 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Contempt
Judge: Hoff, Gary |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of service of juror OSC Proof of service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt served on 07/06/11 by personal delivery. lmi |
|
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of service of juror OSC Proof of service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt served on 06/21/11 by personal delivery. lmi |
|
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of service of juror OSC Proof of service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt served on 6/22/11 by personal delivery. lmi |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.