Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hayes, Douglas Ward, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case against Vasquez, Marcelo, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2011 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time51 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 26-MAY-2011 by KMLATT. |
|
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Regard Harassment
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Harassment Order after Hearing Restraining order after hearing to stop harassment signed by Judge Petrucelli and filed. Restraining order expiration date: 5/26/14 lp |
|
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Petrucelli Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: K Latt Reporter: 10/53/45 Nature of Hearing: Show Cause Regard Harassment The conditions of the restraining order are adopted as the order of the court. The permanent injunctions is to remain in full force and effect for a period of three years from today's date. Order signed. lp |
|
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of temporary restraining order filed. Served on Marcelo Vasquez by personal service on 5/8/2011 . le |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Reissue TRO: Harassment Harassment temporary restraining order/order to show cause re-issued by Judge McGuire filed. Date: 5/26/11 Time: 9:30 am Dept.: 401 lp |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge McGuire Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: K Latt Reporter: 10/18/33 Nature of Hearing: Show Cause Regard Harassment Off calendar, reissuance gratned and reset for 5/26/11 lp |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 28-APR-2011 by KMLATT. |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Regard Harassment
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing and TRO Notice of hearing and temporary restraining order (CLETS) re: harassment signed by Judge Rosemary T. McGuire filed. Temporary restraining order granted. Date: 4-28-11 Time: 9:30am Dept.: 401 mmm |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.