Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
City Of Fresno, League Of Women Voters Of Fresno, Revive The San Joaquin, Sierra Club, filed a(n) 02 Unlimited - Writ Of Mandate case against Board Of Supervisors Of County Of Fresno, County Of Fresno, represented by Johnson, Bruce B., Jr, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Pena, Rosendo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2011 |
Category02 Unlimited - Writ Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions655 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1145 days |
Judgment Received
Date: May 31, 2019Memorandum of Costs filed
Date: June 05, 2019Notice Filed
Date: May 16, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: May 31, 2019Opposition filed
Date: August 16, 2019Stipulation and Order filed
Date: July 19, 2019Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: August 30, 2019Order filed
Date: March 19, 2019Appellant Notice Designating Record - Appendix Only
Date: September 09, 2019Stipulation Filed
Date: March 21, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: May 01, 2019Order filed
Date: May 08, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: May 31, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: June 10, 2019Request Filed
Date: July 23, 2019Order filed
Date: February 16, 2021Letter Received
Date: February 16, 2021Objection filed
Date: February 22, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: February 22, 2021Stipulation Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: February 16, 2021Judgment Received
Date: February 16, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: July 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Objection filed Respondents Objections to Petitioner s Proposed Judgment & Proposed Amended Writ of Mandate |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept 403 Respondent s Alternative [Proposed] Amended Writ Of Mandate |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed of B. Jimenez ISO Respndent's Objection to Proposed Judgment & Amended Writ |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed (Reviewed by Dept 403 on 2/22/21) to Extend Deadline to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre for order and judgment Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Amended Peremptory Writ of Mandate Order filed Amended Peremptory Writ of Mandate (re: Remittitur dated 1/25/21) & Certificate of Mailing Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter to Superior Court (00579726xB0A85) Letter Received Objections of Real Party in Interest to [Proposed] Amended Peremptory Writ of Mandate filed by Petitioners. |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Received for Signature PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to RA on 2/17/21 [Proposed] Amended Peremptory Writ of Mandate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.