Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Corona, Miguel, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2006 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2007 | Docket Event | Franchise Tax Board Court Ordered Debt Program | |
August 21, 2006 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
August 21, 2006 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Pay Abstract | |
August 09, 2006 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Pay | |
July 25, 2006 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay Letter | |
July 10, 2006 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay | |
June 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
June 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Muni Stat Plea | |
June 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Accounts Receivable- Fiscal | |
June 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.