Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Avila, John Jake, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2006 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
August 22, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
August 21, 2006 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Pay Release | |
August 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Pay Abstract | |
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
May 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Pay | |
April 26, 2006 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay Letter | |
April 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay | |
February 16, 2006 | Docket Event | Abstract |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.