Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with James Jennings presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Jennings Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2005 |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2005 | Docket Event | DMV Abstract Record Sent | |
June 07, 2005 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
March 15, 2005 | Docket Event | DMV Abstract Record Sent | |
July 27, 2004 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 27, 2004 | Docket Event |
Review/Request:
Judge: McGregor, John |
|
June 21, 2004 | Docket Event | Probation Memorandum Report, Filed | |
May 10, 2004 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
May 10, 2004 | Docket Event | Privilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived | |
May 10, 2004 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court | |
May 10, 2004 | Docket Event | Waiver of Constitutional Rights and Plea, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.