Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Muscio, Thomas, against Narvaez, Juan Antonio, represented by Pedego, Lori R, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Jennings, James B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJennings, James B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2010 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to FTB IIC | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to FTB IIC | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to Alliance One | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Collections Pending - Alliance One | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to FTB COD | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Collections: Recalled from Alliance One | |
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to FTB IIC | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to Alliance One | |
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Returned from Collection Agency | |
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event | FTP Notice, Mailed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.