Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gj Jedlicka Saddlery Inc, Miller, Martha, Safety Equipment Institute, Troxel Cycling & Fitness Llc, Loge, Martin, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Unlimited Product Liability (24) case represented by Daley, Todd A, against Gj Jedlicka Saddlery Inc, Safety Equipment Institute, Troxel Cycling & Fitness Llc, represented by Behar, Jeffrey S, Bremer, Keith G, Cohen, Robert, Goettsch, Raymond H, Troy, Robert P, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2003 |
CategoryUnlimited Product Liability (24) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed | |
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
February 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Trust Deposit | |
October 13, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal, Filed | |
September 29, 2005 | Docket Event | Summons | |
September 29, 2005 | Docket Event | Request for Partial Dismissal, Filed | |
September 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.