Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt, Michael S, against Hudak, Gary D, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Zel, Canter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2003 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2004 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
July 26, 2004 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
April 13, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Zel, Canter |
|
March 08, 2004 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
February 25, 2004 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
February 25, 2004 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
February 25, 2004 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
February 25, 2004 | Docket Event | Summons | |
February 23, 2004 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
February 23, 2004 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.