Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nowlin, Karen R, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Nowlin, Allen L, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause: CMC | |
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Dismissed/Lack of Prosecution | |
December 19, 1996 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 11, 1996 | Docket Event | Economics Hearing | |
December 04, 1996 | Docket Event | Response | |
November 20, 1996 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 20, 1996 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.