Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Atkinson, Lynn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB1869 | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | 23622(C) VC Notice Filed | |
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings After Issuance of :
Judge: Atkinson, Lynn C. |
|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Promise to Appear | |
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Warrant of Arrest -Returned (Upon Service) | |
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Received | |
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings re:
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event | INFO: | |
July 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Upon Violation of Probation
Judge: Papadakis, H. N. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.