Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Williamson, Jennifer Marie, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Schultz, Peter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 04, 2010 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Continued Arraignment
Judge: DeSantos, Thomas |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Continued Arraignment
Judge: Tarter, Donna |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | INFO: | |
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event | INFO: | |
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings re:
Judge: DeSantos, Thomas |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing:
Judge: Schultz, Peter M. |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event | INFO: | |
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event | INFO: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.