Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Walt Bannon Drilling Inc., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Orkies, Susan, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
Category47 Small Claims $0 - $1,500 |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Fain, Gregory |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed WITHOUT prejudice. PSN Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Off calendar for Court Trial scheduled for 4-7-10 psn . | |
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Letter received Letter from defendant Susan M Orkies received. vs |
|
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Pltf's claim served Plaintiff's claim returned to court sub-served as to Susan Orkies and filed. Cost $110 . cm |
|
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Fain, Gregory |
|
February 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Reset hearing of 3/3/10 TO 4/7/10 @ 8:00am in Clovis Dept. 1 psn . | |
February 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Pltf's claim personal service Plaintiff's claim given to plaintiff for personal service . psn |
|
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Pltf's claim unserved Plaintiff's claim returned to court unserved as to Susan Orkies and filed. Cost $10.00. vs |
|
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$60.00 was made on receipt CLCL28667. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.