Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Canas, Lynette D. filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Oliver, Robert presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryEstate |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions48 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time48 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Terminating Estate - Approval of no assets JBSIS Correction Judge: CONVERSION, JUDGE |
|
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Amended Petition for Probate Judge: Oliver, Robert |
|
March 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Probate order 2 of 2. See Order on First and Final Report of Executor for Final Distribution filed on 3/28/12. jfr 3/29/12 |
|
March 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Oliver Minute Order from Dept.: 303 Clerk: Teresa Avina Reporter: Wendy saffery Nature of Hearing: First and Final Account and Report of Executor, and Petition for Final Distribution Amended Examiner notes are provided to the Petitioner. Mr. Wolfe is sworn for purposes of further inquiry by the Court. Based on the sworn testimony, the Court finds that the distributees consent to taking an undivided interest and Darlene Hardin and Mason Wolfe have received their specific amounts. Petition is granted. Petition is granted; Order signed rkb 4/9/2012 |
|
March 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary (Prob. C. 8002, 10450) Judge: Oliver, Robert |
|
March 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Order on First and Final Report of Executor for Final Distribution. /s/ RO. jfr 3/29/12 Event: Order Final Distrib - No Acct |
|
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Accounting Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary (Prob. C. 8002, 10450) Judge: Oliver, Robert |
|
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Amended document filed First and Final Account and Report of Executor, and Petition for Final Distribution Amended Hearing 3-28-12 at 9am in Dept 303 cd 2-22-12 |
|
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of hearing filed Notice of hearing of First and Final Account and Report of Executor, and Petition for Final Distribution filed. Hearing set on 2-27-12 at 9am in Dept 303 . cd 2-15-12 |
|
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$395.00 was made on receipt PRCE59035. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.