Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ketchens, Deac, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Hrdlicka, Steven R., against Sallam, Deanna, Sallam, Tony, represented by Sallam, Deanna, Sallam, Tony, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with F. Brian Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2010 |
Category32 Limited - Residential Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. cr | |
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE229129. |
|
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 04-OCT-2010 by GCASTILLOGILSTRAP. |
|
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Judge Alvarez Minute Order from Dept.: 98B Clerk: G. Castillo-Gilstrap (gac) Reporter/Tape:2/04/28 Nature of Hearing:Money Damages Plaintiffs Attorney Steven R. Hrdlicka attorney sworn and testifies. Order signed. Notice waived. exd eg |
|
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Money damages after 1169 In accordance with order signed by Judge F. Brian Alvarez on 10/01/10 judgment having been previously entered pursuant to CP1169, Court orders the money damages on behalf of Deac Ketchens against Tony Sallam; Deanna Sallam in the sum of: Principal: $2740. Holdover Damages: $29.91 Interest: $1250. Atty Fees: $1250. Costs: $450. Total: $4469.91 eg |
|
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Money Damages
Judge: Alvarez, Brian |
|
September 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Matter set for hearing Matter set for Money Damages on 10/01/10 at 1:30 p.m. in dept #98B. cs |
|
August 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ filed satisfied poss only Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only. mk |
|
August 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice sent Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 12-AUG-2010 by RALVAREZ. |
|
August 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 06-AUG-2010 by ZEYANG. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.