Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
River View, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Beauty Max Corp, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Black, Donald presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time663 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Bankruptcy Status Conference
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Restored to Court's Control | |
October 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. le Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
October 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for bankruptcy status conference scheduled for 12/20/2012 . Dismissal filed. le | |
October 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Bankruptcy Status Conference
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cal Setting Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 17-OCT-2012 by MMENDOZA. |
|
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for continuance granted Cont for BSC from 10-18-12 to 12-20-12, pending dismissal, per written request of Plaintiff mmm |
|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Bankruptcy Status Conference
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for continuance granted Cont for 7-12-12 TO 10-18-12 Per written request of plaintiff mmm |
|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cal Setting Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 11-JUL-2012 by MMENDOZA. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.