Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lewis, Morgan Virgil, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Mathews, Kathy, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Smith, Bruce presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management122 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2010 |
Category22 Unlimited - Auto |
Time To Trial738 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1008 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Smith, Bruce |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Trial Readiness | |
September 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Judge, Pro Tempore |
|
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Off calendar for trial readiness scheduled for 9/20/13. Dismissal filed. dhouston | |
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Off calendar for settlement conference scheduled for 9/4/13. Dismissal filed. dhouston | |
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Off calendar for jury trial scheduled for 9/23/13. Dismissal filed. dhouston | |
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Entire action dismissed with prejudice. dhouston Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Smith, Bruce |
|
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Smith, Bruce |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Judge, Pro Tempore |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.