Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yang, Victor, Tidyman-Jones, Laurie, Spear, Gricelda, Serda, Adam, Santos, Geraldine, (total of 23) See All filed a(n) 02 Unlimited - Writ Of Mandate case against Governing Board, State Center Community College District, State Center Community College District, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2010 |
Category02 Unlimited - Writ Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions146 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time934 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of dismissal filed. dhouston | |
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed With prejudice. gs Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of change of address of Lieber Cassidy Whitmore. (Attorneys for Respondents and Defendants) lmi | |
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer filed Answer to Amended writ of mandamus filed. TLC |
|
December 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amended document filed Amended petition for writ of mandate filed. sg |
|
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 15-DEC-2010 by MSANTANA. |
|
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Hamilton Minute Order from Dept.: 402 Clerk: M.Santana Reporter: Not Reported Nature of Hearing: From Chambers - Matter having been previously taken under advisement 12/02/2010 the court now rules. To adopt the tentative ruling as the order of the court, striking the pleading sua sponte pursuant to CCP 436 with leave to amend as stated infra. An amended pleading in conformity with this order is to be filed within 10 days of notice of the ruling. The time in which the pleading can be amended will run form service by the clerk of the minute order. mgs |
|
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Any Comment Order After Hearing signed and issued. Forwarded to clerks office 12/15/10, for further processing. mgs |
|
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Hamilton Minute Order from Dept.: 402 Clerk: M.Santana Reporter: Stacy Obel-Jorgensen Nature of Hearing: Demurrer- Matter taken under advisement. mgs |
|
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 02-DEC-2010 by MSANTANA. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.