Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez, Jesus, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Rodriguez, Juan, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Judge, No Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2002 |
CategorySmall Claims In Co 12 Or Fewer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
October 16, 2002 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
October 10, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
October 10, 2002 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
September 11, 2002 | Docket Event | Notice of Order Setting New Date, Filed | |
September 09, 2002 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
September 09, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 02, 2002 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Small Claims | |
July 30, 2002 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Court, Filed | |
July 30, 2002 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.