Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Simmons, Mary Cassandra, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Denise de Bellefeuille presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2002 |
CategoryUnlimited Misc Petition - Name Change |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Name Change
Judge: deBellefeuille, Denise |
|
October 10, 2002 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed -OSC:Name Change: Granted, Filed; |
|
October 10, 2002 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name, Filed Filed; Filed By Petitioner Pro Per; |
|
August 29, 2002 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication, Filed Order to Show Cause was Published Aug 7 14 21 and 28, Filed; Filed By Petitioner; |
|
July 30, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause, Filed for Change of Name, Filed; Filed By Petitioner Pro Per; Hrg 08-15-02 dept 12 ; 07/26/2002 Received; |
|
July 29, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed Judge Denise de Bellefeuille was Assigned, Filed; |
|
July 29, 2002 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed Order and Notice of Case Assignment was Mailed to, Filed; Mary Simmons; |
|
July 25, 2002 | Docket Event |
New Filed Case Conversion Addition for Reporting |
|
July 25, 2002 | Docket Event |
Petition for Change of Name, Filed Filed; Filed By Petitioner Pro Per; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.