Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Mcintosh, Desmond, against Wooten, Eli Hunter, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Talmage, Deborah presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2002 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMarch 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2002 | Docket Event | Proof of Enrollment, Filed | |
September 16, 2002 | Docket Event | Transfer-In Family Law Post Judgment (JBSIS) | |
September 13, 2002 | Docket Event | DMV Abstract Record Sent | |
August 26, 2002 | Docket Event | Arrest Disposition Report, Sent | |
August 23, 2002 | Docket Event | Sentencing Hearing Held | |
August 23, 2002 | Docket Event | Charges and Direct Consequence of Plea | |
August 23, 2002 | Docket Event | Probation Order, Filed | |
August 23, 2002 | Docket Event | Defendant Waived Counsel | |
August 23, 2002 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
August 23, 2002 | Docket Event | Privilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.