Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Santa Barbara - District Attorney'S Office, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Gutierrez, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Belasco, Steven D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 19, 2002 |
CategorySmall Claims > 12 Claims Filed |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2002 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Belasco, Steven D |
|
August 14, 2002 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
August 12, 2002 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Judgment, Filed | |
August 01, 2002 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Small Claims | |
July 19, 2002 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim | |
July 19, 2002 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
July 19, 2002 | Docket Event | Government Exemption | |
July 19, 2002 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Court, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.