Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Muscio, Thomas, against Jaimes, Arnulfo, represented by Johnston, Mary Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Garcia, Arthur presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2002 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedJune 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to Alliance One | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Delinquent - Court : FTP | |
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Returned from Collection Agency | |
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Warrant Recall: Order Dated 6/10/08 | |
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Restored To Court Control | |
June 06, 2008 | Docket Event | FTP Notice, Mailed | |
February 14, 2003 | Docket Event | DMV Abstract Record Sent | |
February 03, 2003 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Removed From Court Control | |
February 03, 2003 | Docket Event | Warrant, Issued | |
December 31, 2002 | Docket Event | FTP Notice, Mailed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.