Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Perlin, Darryl, against Carlson, David Roger, represented by Barron, Rick T, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Dodds, Bruce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDodds, Bruce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 08, 2001 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedJune 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2003 | Docket Event | Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings, Filed | |
July 24, 2003 | Docket Event | Pre-Plea Drug Court (SATC) Terminated-Unsuccessful | |
July 24, 2003 | Docket Event |
PC 1210.1 Graduation
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
July 24, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 17, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 17, 2003 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court | |
July 17, 2003 | Docket Event |
SATC Pre-PDC Review
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
July 16, 2003 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
June 26, 2003 | Docket Event |
SATC Pre-PDC Review
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
June 26, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.