Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Perlin, Darryl, against Storm, Dimitri Zedo, represented by Moore, Rory, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Dodds, Bruce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDodds, Bruce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2002 |
CategoryMental Competency Doubt-Pc 1368 |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2002 | Docket Event | MH Supervision Termination - Remand Criminal Proceedings | |
December 13, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
December 13, 2002 | Docket Event |
Return from Hospital - PC 1372
Judge: Lodge, Joseph |
|
December 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
Return from Hospital - PC 1372
Judge: Lodge, Joseph |
|
December 06, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
November 26, 2002 | Docket Event |
Return from Hospital - PC 1372
Judge: Lodge, Joseph |
|
November 26, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
November 12, 2002 | Docket Event |
Return from Hospital - PC 1372
Judge: Lodge, Joseph |
|
November 12, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
October 24, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.