Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Mcintosh, Desmond, against Bandy, Mason Edward, Iii, represented by Sommers, Bob, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with DeCaro, Edward presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2002 | Docket Event | Probation Order, Filed | |
March 13, 2002 | Docket Event | DMV Abstract Record Sent | |
March 08, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
March 08, 2002 | Docket Event |
Review/Request:
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
March 01, 2002 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Compliance, Filed | |
February 21, 2002 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court | |
February 21, 2002 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered | |
February 21, 2002 | Docket Event | Clerk's Note | |
February 21, 2002 | Docket Event | Document, Filed | |
February 21, 2002 | Docket Event | Mandatory Appearance Satisfied |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.