Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Gittler, Jeffrey, against Hummel, Sherry Penn, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Gordon, William L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2001 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2001 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte: Request/Review
Judge: Judge, No Assigned |
|
September 19, 2001 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court | |
September 19, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Gordon, William L |
|
September 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Gordon, William L |
|
September 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Gordon, William L |
|
August 20, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Gordon, William L |
|
August 06, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Gordon, William L |
|
July 23, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Loberg, Harry |
|
July 06, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
July 06, 2001 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.