Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Mcintosh, Desmond, against Cornell, Lee Jiro, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Talmage, Deborah presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTalmage, Deborah Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2002 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2002 | Docket Event | Notice of Completion, Filed | |
February 15, 2002 | Docket Event | Notice of Completion, Filed | |
January 31, 2002 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Compliance, Filed | |
January 29, 2002 | Docket Event | Correspondence, Received | |
January 24, 2002 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Compliance, Filed | |
August 27, 2001 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered | |
August 27, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
August 27, 2001 | Docket Event | Mandatory Appearance Satisfied | |
August 20, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
August 13, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.