Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Mcintosh, Desmond, against Evans, Latif Robert, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Talmage, Deborah presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTalmage, Deborah Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2001 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2001 | Docket Event |
Sentence/Disposition Hearing
Judge: Judge, No Assigned |
|
October 22, 2001 | Docket Event | Sentencing Hearing Held | |
July 25, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Restored To Court Control | |
July 24, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
July 23, 2001 | Docket Event |
Warrant Arraignment
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
July 23, 2001 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered | |
July 23, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant Recall, Filed | |
July 11, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Removed From Court Control | |
July 11, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant, Issued | |
July 11, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.