Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Mcintosh, Desmond, against Pettygrove, Daniel Scott, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Slater, Craig M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSlater, Craig M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 26, 2001 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedJune 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Warrant Recall: Order Dated 6/10/08 | |
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Restored To Court Control | |
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event | FTP Notice, Mailed | |
October 15, 2001 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte: Request/Review
Judge: Slater, Craig M |
|
October 15, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant, Issued | |
October 15, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Removed From Court Control | |
September 21, 2001 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte: Request/Review
Judge: Judge, No Assigned |
|
July 17, 2001 | Docket Event | Clerk's Note | |
July 13, 2001 | Docket Event | Mandatory Appearance Satisfied | |
July 13, 2001 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.