Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Saikeo, Boun, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Auau, Tevesi Amerperosa, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Belasco, Steven D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBelasco, Steven D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 08, 2001 |
CategorySmall Claims In Co 12 Or Fewer |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Note Pursuant to GC 68153, this case has been destroyed., |
|
December 13, 2001 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Belasco, Steven D |
|
December 13, 2001 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed Filed; |
|
December 13, 2001 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Filed; |
|
November 27, 2001 | Docket Event |
Correspondence, Received Letter received from deft to extend the court date, Received; untill futher notice. I sent a l etter back to deft about continuances with copies of instructions and back of Plaintiff's Claim with areas highlighted and that he mightwant to get in touch with an atty; 11/27/2001 Filed; |
|
November 15, 2001 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Small Claims for Tevesi Amerperosa Auau, Filed; |
|
November 08, 2001 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Court, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
November 08, 2001 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim Claim Amount/Principal: $1200.00 Cost: $50.00 After pmt the deft did not to the work as agreed |
|
November 08, 2001 | Docket Event |
New Filed Case Conversion Addition for Reporting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.