Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Manson, Geoffrey Alexander, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with deBellefeuille, Denise presiding.
Case Number |
JudgedeBellefeuille, Denise Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2001 |
CategoryUnlimited Misc Petition - Name Change |
Last RefreshedJuly 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2001 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Name Change
Judge: deBellefeuille, Denise |
|
August 23, 2001 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Pet. for Name Change, Filed; Petition Granted. ; |
|
August 23, 2001 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name, Filed Filed; Filed By Petitioner; |
|
July 30, 2001 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication, Filed Filed; Filed By Petitioner; |
|
July 03, 2001 | Docket Event |
Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed Filed; |
|
June 29, 2001 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause, Filed for Name Change - Hrg date 8-23-01, Filed; 06/28/2001 Received; |
|
June 27, 2001 | Docket Event |
New Filed Case Conversion Addition for Reporting |
|
June 27, 2001 | Docket Event |
Petition for Change of Name, Filed Filed; Filed By Petitioner; |
|
June 27, 2001 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed Filed; Filed By Petitioner; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.