Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fleming, Scott Mitchell, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Grant, April D, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Belasco, Steven D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBelasco, Steven D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims In Co 12 Or Fewer |
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Clerk's Note | |
February 15, 2005 | Docket Event | Clerk's Note | |
October 03, 2001 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment, Filed | |
September 04, 2001 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Small Claims | |
August 30, 2001 | Docket Event |
Debtor's Examination
Judge: Belasco, Steven D |
|
August 30, 2001 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 23, 2001 | Docket Event |
Debtor's Examination
Judge: Belasco, Steven D |
|
August 23, 2001 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 17, 2001 | Docket Event | Application & Order to Appear for Exam, Filed | |
March 22, 2001 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Decision, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.