Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Tolks, Arnie, against Hang, Nhia, represented by Montes De Oca, Raimundo, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Hill, Brian E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHill, Brian E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2002 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2004 | Docket Event | Reporter's Transcript - Pronouncement of Judgment, Filed | |
June 17, 2004 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Filed | |
June 16, 2004 | Docket Event | Sentencing Hearing Held | |
June 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Hearing
Judge: Hill, Brian E |
|
June 16, 2004 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Hearing
Judge: Gordon, William L |
|
June 15, 2004 | Docket Event | Document, Filed | |
June 15, 2004 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
May 25, 2004 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Hearing Setting
Judge: Hill, Brian E |
|
May 25, 2004 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.