Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Mcintosh, Desmond, against Obrien, Cleat, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Talmage, Deborah presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTalmage, Deborah Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2002 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2003 | Docket Event | DMV Abstract Record Sent | |
August 25, 2003 | Docket Event | Warrant Recall, Filed | |
August 25, 2003 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
August 25, 2003 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Restored To Court Control | |
July 29, 2003 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
January 28, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Warrant Arraignment
Judge: DeCaro, Edward |
|
September 10, 2002 | Docket Event | DMV Abstract Record Sent | |
September 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte: Issue Bench/Arrest Warrant
Judge: Loberg, Harry |
|
September 04, 2002 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Removed From Court Control |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.