Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Fritz, Lisa A, against Toth, Lucas Scott, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Talmage, Deborah presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2003 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2003 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
November 13, 2003 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
November 03, 2003 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
October 14, 2003 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
September 30, 2003 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
September 04, 2003 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
August 20, 2003 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
July 24, 2003 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
June 19, 2003 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
June 10, 2003 | Docket Event | Fine Comment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.