Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Mcintosh, Desmond, against Perez, Ruben Casillas, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Loberg, Harry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLoberg, Harry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2000 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedJune 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2012 | Docket Event | DOJ Request - Subsequent | |
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed per PC 1203.4 | |
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte: PC 1203.4 Petition Misdemeanor Case
Judge: Ochoa, Frank J |
|
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event | 1203.4 PC Petition/Application | |
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte: PC 1203.4 Petition Misdemeanor Case
Judge: Ochoa, Frank J |
|
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
October 25, 2000 | Docket Event |
Modification of Sentence
Judge: Loberg, Harry |
|
September 22, 2000 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered | |
September 22, 2000 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: DeCaro, Edward |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.