Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Gittler, Jeffrey, against Hecker, Lisa Marie, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Gordon, William L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGordon, William L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2000 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2000 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court | |
December 04, 2000 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Gordon, William L |
|
November 13, 2000 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Gordon, William L |
|
October 23, 2000 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Gordon, William L |
|
October 02, 2000 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Gordon, William L |
|
September 11, 2000 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered | |
September 11, 2000 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: DeCaro, Edward |
|
August 28, 2000 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.