Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Mcintosh, Desmond, against Coon, David Kent, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with deBellefeuille, Denise presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2000 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Restored To Court Control | |
March 12, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant Recall, Filed | |
March 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Warrant Arraignment
Judge: DeCaro, Edward |
|
March 05, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant, Issued | |
March 05, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Removed From Court Control | |
March 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte: Request/Review
Judge: deBellefeuille, Denise |
|
November 07, 2000 | Docket Event | Clerk's Note | |
November 01, 2000 | Docket Event |
Warrant Arraignment
Judge: DeCaro, Edward |
|
October 03, 2000 | Docket Event | Clerk's Note | |
August 30, 2000 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte: Request/Review
Judge: Loberg, Harry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.