Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Cota, Brian J, against Nunez, Miguel, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Loberg, Harry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2000 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedMay 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2000 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered | |
June 12, 2000 | Docket Event |
Sentence/Disposition Hearing
Judge: Loberg, Harry |
|
June 12, 2000 | Docket Event | Sentencing Hearing Held | |
June 12, 2000 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court | |
June 07, 2000 | Docket Event |
Sentence/Disposition Hearing
Judge: Loberg, Harry |
|
June 07, 2000 | Docket Event | Sentencing Hearing Held | |
May 31, 2000 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Restored To Court Control | |
May 30, 2000 | Docket Event |
Warrant Arraignment
Judge: DeCaro, Edward |
|
May 30, 2000 | Docket Event | Warrant Recall, Filed | |
April 27, 2000 | Docket Event |
Sentence/Disposition Hearing
Judge: Loberg, Harry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.